THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:18:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 238 Bertie Street
Suite 7
Fort Erie Ontario L2A 1Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 871-1220
Fax: (905) 871-1221

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jul 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 16 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael A. Csanadi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Csanadi (CPSO#: 58066 )
Business Address: 238 Bertie Street
Suite 7
Fort Erie Ontario L2A 1Z3
(905) 871-1220

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 238 Bertie Street
Suite 7
Fort Erie Ontario L2A 1Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 871-1220
Fax: (905) 871-1221

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jul 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 16 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael A. Csanadi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Csanadi (CPSO#: 58066 )
Business Address: 238 Bertie Street
Suite 7
Fort Erie Ontario L2A 1Z3
(905) 871-1220

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL ANTHONY CSANADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CSANADI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL ANTHONY CSANADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CSANADI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Jun 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Apr 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 1988

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1987