THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:42:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1500-150 York St
Toronto ON M5H 3S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-350-5900
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Aug 1989
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Nord Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Nord (CPSO#: 58091 )
Business Address: 1500-150 York Street
Toronto Ontario M5H 3S5

Corporation Name: Peter Nord Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Aug 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1500-150 York St
Toronto ON M5H 3S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-350-5900
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Aug 1989
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Nord Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Nord (CPSO#: 58091 )
Business Address: 1500-150 York Street
Toronto Ontario M5H 3S5

Corporation Name: Peter Nord Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Aug 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER WILLIAM NORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NORD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER WILLIAM NORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NORD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 17 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 1995

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1987