THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:52:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Belgrade, 1980
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SERBIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 480
700 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M6A 3B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 789-7957
Extension: 3211
Fax: (416) 789-9079
Address: 60 West Drive
Brampton, Ontario
CMHA
Brampton Ontario L6T 3T6
Phone: 416 854 9909
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 250-A
1560 Yonge street
Toronto Ontario M4T 2S9
Phone: (416) 854-9909
Fax: (416) 481-6514

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 07 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Besir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Besir (CPSO#: 58122 )
Business Address: Suite 250-A
1560 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4T 2S9
(416) 854-9909
Business Address: 102 - 60 West Drive
Brampton Ontario L6T 3T6
(905) 459-2282
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Avenue
5th Floor
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Business Address: Suite 480
700 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M6A 3B4
(416) 789-7957

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SERBIAN
Medical School: University of Belgrade, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 480
700 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M6A 3B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 789-7957
Extension: 3211
Fax: (416) 789-9079
Address: 60 West Drive
Brampton, Ontario
CMHA
Brampton Ontario L6T 3T6
Phone: 416 854 9909
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 250-A
1560 Yonge street
Toronto Ontario M4T 2S9
Phone: (416) 854-9909
Fax: (416) 481-6514

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 07 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Besir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Besir (CPSO#: 58122 )
Business Address: Suite 250-A
1560 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4T 2S9
(416) 854-9909
Business Address: 102 - 60 West Drive
Brampton Ontario L6T 3T6
(905) 459-2282
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Avenue
5th Floor
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Business Address: Suite 480
700 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M6A 3B4
(416) 789-7957

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIRJANA BESIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BESIR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIRJANA BESIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BESIR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Belgrade, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1987