THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:26:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5 MC-420 A
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-5236
Fax: (416) 603-5680
Address: 40 Shellington Place, Suite 101
Brantford Ontario N3S 0C5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 462 Birchmount Road, Unit 1B
Scarborough Ontario M1K 1N8
Phone: 416-690-9437
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 216 West Street, Suite 304
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1S8
Phone: 519-428-1243
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 23 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Health Care Toronto Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Providence Health Care Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Iwanochko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Mar 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Iwanochko (CPSO#: 58126 )
Business Address: EW5-423
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5236
Business Address: 40 Shellington Place
Brantford Ontario N3C 0C5
(519) 753-9581
Business Address: Suite 304
216 West Street
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1S8
(519) 428-1243
Business Address: Suite 8
2575 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 1L5
(416) 690-9437
Business Address: 462 Birchmount Rd
Scarborough ON M1K 1N8
416 690 9441

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5 MC-420 A
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-5236
Fax: (416) 603-5680
Address: 40 Shellington Place, Suite 101
Brantford Ontario N3S 0C5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 462 Birchmount Road, Unit 1B
Scarborough Ontario M1K 1N8
Phone: 416-690-9437
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 216 West Street, Suite 304
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1S8
Phone: 519-428-1243
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 23 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Health Care Toronto Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Providence Health Care Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Iwanochko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Mar 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Iwanochko (CPSO#: 58126 )
Business Address: EW5-423
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5236
Business Address: 40 Shellington Place
Brantford Ontario N3C 0C5
(519) 753-9581
Business Address: Suite 304
216 West Street
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1S8
(519) 428-1243
Business Address: Suite 8
2575 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 1L5
(416) 690-9437
Business Address: 462 Birchmount Rd
Scarborough ON M1K 1N8
416 690 9441

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT MARK IWANOCHKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IWANOCHKO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT MARK IWANOCHKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IWANOCHKO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1987