THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:46:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 48
2140 North Park Drive
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 874-1759
Fax: (905) 874-1652

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 18 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. Bruce Paitich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 May 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Paitich (CPSO#: 58138 )
Business Address: Unit 48
2140 North Park Drive
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C9
(905) 874-1759

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 48
2140 North Park Drive
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 874-1759
Fax: (905) 874-1652

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 18 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. Bruce Paitich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 May 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Paitich (CPSO#: 58138 )
Business Address: Unit 48
2140 North Park Drive
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C9
(905) 874-1759

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAMERON BRUCE PAITICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAITICH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAMERON BRUCE PAITICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAITICH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1987