THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 00:42:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1987
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6142
Fax: (519) 663-3291

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Farquhar Myers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jun 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Myers (CPSO#: 58160 ) Dr. D. Farquhar (CPSO#: 50526 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6142
Fax: (519) 663-3291

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Farquhar Myers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jun 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Myers (CPSO#: 58160 ) Dr. D. Farquhar (CPSO#: 50526 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHRYN ANN MYERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MYERS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHRYN ANN MYERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MYERS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 1993

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1987