THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:44:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1987
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 310
460 Springbank
London Ontario N6J 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 672-3509
Fax: (519) 672-8621

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Aug 1989
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Catherine E. Frederick Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Frederick (CPSO#: 58172 )
Business Address: Suite 310
460 Springbank Drive
London Ontario N6J 0A8
(519) 672-3509

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 310
460 Springbank
London Ontario N6J 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 672-3509
Fax: (519) 672-8621

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Aug 1989
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Catherine E. Frederick Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Frederick (CPSO#: 58172 )
Business Address: Suite 310
460 Springbank Drive
London Ontario N6J 0A8
(519) 672-3509

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE ELIZABETH FREDERICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREDERICK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE ELIZABETH FREDERICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREDERICK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Oct 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1987