THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:57:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 142 Nahani Way
Mississauga Ontario L4Z 3J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 568-0355
Fax: (905) 568-0307

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Aug 1989
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tommy Hong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Oct 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Hong (CPSO#: 58193 )
Business Address: 142 Nahani Way
Mississauga Ontario L4Z 3J1
(905) 568-0355

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 142 Nahani Way
Mississauga Ontario L4Z 3J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 568-0355
Fax: (905) 568-0307

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Aug 1989
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tommy Hong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Oct 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Hong (CPSO#: 58193 )
Business Address: 142 Nahani Way
Mississauga Ontario L4Z 3J1
(905) 568-0355

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TOMMY HONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TOMMY HONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1987