THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:31:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 80 Michael Cowpland Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2M 1P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6135521249
Fax: 343-321-1680
Address: 1062 Klondike Rd
Ottawa Ontario K2K 1X7
Phone: 613-599-3321
Fax: 613-595-1600

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Aug 1989
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robin Beardsley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Beardsley (CPSO#: 58240 )
Business Address: 80 Michael Cowpland Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2M 1P6
(613) 599-3321
Business Address: 1062 Klondike Road
Kanata Ontario K2K 1X7
613-552-1249

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 80 Michael Cowpland Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2M 1P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6135521249
Fax: 343-321-1680
Address: 1062 Klondike Rd
Ottawa Ontario K2K 1X7
Phone: 613-599-3321
Fax: 613-595-1600

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Aug 1989
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robin Beardsley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Beardsley (CPSO#: 58240 )
Business Address: 80 Michael Cowpland Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2M 1P6
(613) 599-3321
Business Address: 1062 Klondike Road
Kanata Ontario K2K 1X7
613-552-1249

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBIN MAUD BEARDSLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEARDSLEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBIN MAUD BEARDSLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEARDSLEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Dec 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1987