THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 05:01:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, DUTCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Emergency Department
Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 5S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 938-4240
Extension: 2227
Fax: (613) 938-5552
Address: Winchester District
Memorial Hospital
566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Phone: (613) 774-2420
Extension: 5229
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Van Hees Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Van Hees (CPSO#: 58272 )
Business Address: Emergency Department
Cornwall Community Hospital
1050 - 840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 5S5
(613) 938-4240 Extn: 2227

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, DUTCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Emergency Department
Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 5S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 938-4240
Extension: 2227
Fax: (613) 938-5552
Address: Winchester District
Memorial Hospital
566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Phone: (613) 774-2420
Extension: 5229
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Van Hees Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Van Hees (CPSO#: 58272 )
Business Address: Emergency Department
Cornwall Community Hospital
1050 - 840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 5S5
(613) 938-4240 Extn: 2227

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACQUELINE MARIA VAN HEES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN HEES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACQUELINE MARIA VAN HEES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN HEES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Jun 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1988

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1987