THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 04:45:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Rouge Valley Centenary Emergency
2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Ontario M1E 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 281-7270
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K.C. Moran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Moran (CPSO#: 58290 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 2B9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Rouge Valley Centenary Emergency
2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Ontario M1E 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 281-7270
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K.C. Moran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Moran (CPSO#: 58290 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 2B9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN CHARLES MORAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN CHARLES MORAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Jun 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 1988

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1987