THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:51:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Riverside Eye Care Centre
1967 Riverside Dr.
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613)738-8400
Extension: 88537
Fax: (613) 738-8394

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 28 Oct 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking to access their medical record can contact: eyeDOCS 1285 Kilborn Ave Ottawa ON K1H 6K9 Tel: 613-733-8400.
Date Received: 15 Jan 2020

Instructions/Address: Paitents seeking to access their medical record can contact:

eyeDOCS
1285 Kilborn Ave
Ottawa ON K1H 6K(

Tel: 613-733-8400
Date Received: 21 Dec 2018

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B.C. Weston Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Weston (CPSO#: 58303 )
Business Address: Riverside Eye Care Centre
3rd Floor
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 9A2
(613) 738-8537

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Riverside Eye Care Centre
1967 Riverside Dr.
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613)738-8400
Extension: 88537
Fax: (613) 738-8394

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 28 Oct 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking to access their medical record can contact: eyeDOCS 1285 Kilborn Ave Ottawa ON K1H 6K9 Tel: 613-733-8400.
Date Received: 15 Jan 2020

Instructions/Address: Paitents seeking to access their medical record can contact:

eyeDOCS
1285 Kilborn Ave
Ottawa ON K1H 6K(

Tel: 613-733-8400
Date Received: 21 Dec 2018

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B.C. Weston Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Weston (CPSO#: 58303 )
Business Address: Riverside Eye Care Centre
3rd Floor
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 9A2
(613) 738-8537

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BONNIE CYNTHIA WESTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WESTON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BONNIE CYNTHIA WESTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WESTON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1987