THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:52:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2000 Credit Valley Road
Suite 502
Mississauga Ontario L5M 4N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 820-8748
Fax: (866) 820-5299

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carol Wade Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Wade (CPSO#: 58313 )
Business Address: 502 - 2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga Ontario L5M 4N4
(905) 820-8748

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2000 Credit Valley Road
Suite 502
Mississauga Ontario L5M 4N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 820-8748
Fax: (866) 820-5299

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carol Wade Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Wade (CPSO#: 58313 )
Business Address: 502 - 2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga Ontario L5M 4N4
(905) 820-8748

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROL LOUISE WADE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WADE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROL LOUISE WADE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WADE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Jun 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 1988

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1987