THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:50:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital, General Campus
Department of Medical Imaging
501 Smyth Road
2nd Floor, Room L2121a
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8571
Fax: (613) 737-8830
Address: Almonte General Hosp
75 Spring St SS1
Dept of Medical Imaging
Almonte Ontario K0A 1A0
Phone: (613) 256-2500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 350 John St N
Arnprior and District Memorial Hosp
Arnprior Ontario K7S 2P6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St Francis Memorial Hospital
7 St Francis Memorial Drive
Barry's Bay, Ontario
Barry's Bay Ontario K0J 1T0
Phone: (613) 756-3044
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 110 Michael Cowpland Dr
Merivale Medical Imaging
Kanata ON K2M 1P6
Phone: 6137271072
Extension: 231
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 601 Limoges Rd
Merivale Medical Imaging
Limoges ON K0A 2M0
Phone: 6137271072
Extension: 231
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 201-1370 Clyde Ave
Merivale Medical Imaging
Nepean ON K2G 3H8
Phone: 6137271072
Extension: 231
Fax: No Information Available
Address: THE OTTAWA HOSPITAL-RIVERSIDE CAMPU
1967 RIVERSIDE DR
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 737-8571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: THE OTTAWA HOSPITAL-CIVIC CAMPUS
DEPARTMENT OF MEDICAL IMAGING
1053 CARLING AVE
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 737-8571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan St north
Renfrew, Ontario
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
Phone: (613) 432-4851
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Winchester District Memorial HOsp
Dept. of Medical Imaging
566 Louise St
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 29 May 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jose Aquino Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Aquino Jr (CPSO#: 58341 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 761-5476
Business Address: St Francis Memorial Hospital
7 St Francis Memorial Drive
Barry's Bay Ontario K0J 1T0
Business Address: 586 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Business Address: Almonte General Hospital
75 Spring Street SS1
Almonte Ontario K0A 1A0
Business Address: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
Business Address: Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital
350 John Street North
Arnprior Ontario K7S 2P6
Business Address: 1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
(613) 761-5476
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 761-5476
Business Address: 1370 Clyde Ave
Merivale Medical Imaging
Ottawa ON K2G 3H8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital, General Campus
Department of Medical Imaging
501 Smyth Road
2nd Floor, Room L2121a
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8571
Fax: (613) 737-8830
Address: Almonte General Hosp
75 Spring St SS1
Dept of Medical Imaging
Almonte Ontario K0A 1A0
Phone: (613) 256-2500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 350 John St N
Arnprior and District Memorial Hosp
Arnprior Ontario K7S 2P6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St Francis Memorial Hospital
7 St Francis Memorial Drive
Barry's Bay, Ontario
Barry's Bay Ontario K0J 1T0
Phone: (613) 756-3044
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 110 Michael Cowpland Dr
Merivale Medical Imaging
Kanata ON K2M 1P6
Phone: 6137271072
Extension: 231
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 601 Limoges Rd
Merivale Medical Imaging
Limoges ON K0A 2M0
Phone: 6137271072
Extension: 231
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 201-1370 Clyde Ave
Merivale Medical Imaging
Nepean ON K2G 3H8
Phone: 6137271072
Extension: 231
Fax: No Information Available
Address: THE OTTAWA HOSPITAL-RIVERSIDE CAMPU
1967 RIVERSIDE DR
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 737-8571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: THE OTTAWA HOSPITAL-CIVIC CAMPUS
DEPARTMENT OF MEDICAL IMAGING
1053 CARLING AVE
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 737-8571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan St north
Renfrew, Ontario
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
Phone: (613) 432-4851
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Winchester District Memorial HOsp
Dept. of Medical Imaging
566 Louise St
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 29 May 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jose Aquino Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Aquino Jr (CPSO#: 58341 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 761-5476
Business Address: St Francis Memorial Hospital
7 St Francis Memorial Drive
Barry's Bay Ontario K0J 1T0
Business Address: 586 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Business Address: Almonte General Hospital
75 Spring Street SS1
Almonte Ontario K0A 1A0
Business Address: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
Business Address: Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital
350 John Street North
Arnprior Ontario K7S 2P6
Business Address: 1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
(613) 761-5476
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 761-5476
Business Address: 1370 Clyde Ave
Merivale Medical Imaging
Ottawa ON K2G 3H8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSE AQUINO JR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AQUINO JR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSE AQUINO JR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AQUINO JR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jun 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1987