THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:40:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: Robb-Aquino, Marjorie Elizabeth (Used Until: 13 Feb 2007)
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1987
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401 Smyth Rd
CHEO/Mental Health
Department of Psychiatry
6 West
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-737-7600
Fax: 613-738-2891

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 28 May 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 28 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cornwall General Hospital Cornwall
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Cornwall General Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marjorie Robb Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Robb (CPSO#: 58342 )

General Information

Former Name: Robb-Aquino, Marjorie Elizabeth (Used Until: 13 Feb 2007)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401 Smyth Rd
CHEO/Mental Health
Department of Psychiatry
6 West
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-737-7600
Fax: 613-738-2891

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 28 May 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 28 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cornwall General Hospital Cornwall
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Cornwall General Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marjorie Robb Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Robb (CPSO#: 58342 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARJORIE ELIZABETH ROBB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARJORIE ELIZABETH ROBB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Apr 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Nov 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1987