THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:32:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 797 Broadview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 2P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 463-3228
Fax: 416 463-7868
Address: 3585 Keele Street
Unit #10
North York Ontario M3J 3H5
Phone: (416) 614-9686
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Nov 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kenneth Lam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jun 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lam (CPSO#: 58414 )
Business Address: Unit 10
3583 Keele Street
North York Ontario M3J 3H5
(416) 614-9686
Business Address: 797 Broadview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 2P8
(416) 463-3228

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 797 Broadview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 2P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 463-3228
Fax: 416 463-7868
Address: 3585 Keele Street
Unit #10
North York Ontario M3J 3H5
Phone: (416) 614-9686
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Nov 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kenneth Lam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jun 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lam (CPSO#: 58414 )
Business Address: Unit 10
3583 Keele Street
North York Ontario M3J 3H5
(416) 614-9686
Business Address: 797 Broadview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 2P8
(416) 463-3228

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KENNETH W K LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KENNETH W K LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1987