THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:07:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 234A Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 325-2487
Fax: (705) 325-1906
Address: 210 Memorial Ave Suite 125
Orillia Ontario L3V 7V1
Phone: 705-3263499
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Aug 1989
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aggarwal Kennedy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Feb 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kennedy (CPSO#: 58418 ) Dr. R. Aggarwal (CPSO#: 58196 )
Business Address: 234A Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z6
(705) 325-2487

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 234A Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 325-2487
Fax: (705) 325-1906
Address: 210 Memorial Ave Suite 125
Orillia Ontario L3V 7V1
Phone: 705-3263499
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Aug 1989
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aggarwal Kennedy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Feb 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kennedy (CPSO#: 58418 ) Dr. R. Aggarwal (CPSO#: 58196 )
Business Address: 234A Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z6
(705) 325-2487

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN MARGARET KENNEDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENNEDY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN MARGARET KENNEDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENNEDY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1987