THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:08:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Building A, Unit 2
8000 Bathurst Street
Thornhill Ontario L4J 0B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 709-9709
Fax: (905) 709-9701

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Oct 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Aug 1989
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robin Pellow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Pellow (CPSO#: 58453 )
Business Address: Building A
2A - 8000 Bathurst Street
Thornhill Ontario L4J 0B8
(905) 709-9709

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Building A, Unit 2
8000 Bathurst Street
Thornhill Ontario L4J 0B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 709-9709
Fax: (905) 709-9701

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Oct 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Aug 1989
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robin Pellow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Pellow (CPSO#: 58453 )
Business Address: Building A
2A - 8000 Bathurst Street
Thornhill Ontario L4J 0B8
(905) 709-9709

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK ROBIN PELLOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PELLOW is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK ROBIN PELLOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PELLOW is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1987