THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:20:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1987
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AMERICAN SIGN LANGUAGE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2180 Speakman Drive
Wellbrook Place
Mississauga Ontario L5K 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4376557934
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jan 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 04 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients can request a copy of their medical record by contacting:
Well Health Port Credit
201-333 Lakeshore Road West
Mississauga, ON L5H 1G9
Phone: 905-274-7055
Fax: 905-274-0227
Date Received: 20 Apr 2025

Instructions/Address: Patients can request a copy of their medical record by contacting:

Well Health Port Credit
201-333 Lakeshore Road West
Mississauga, ON L5H 1G9
Phone: 905-274-7055
Fax: 905-607-2227
Date Received: 07 Apr 2025

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lori Coman-Wood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Coman-Wood (CPSO#: 58459 )
Business Address: 2180 Speakman Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5K 0B1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AMERICAN SIGN LANGUAGE
Medical School: Queen's University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2180 Speakman Drive
Wellbrook Place
Mississauga Ontario L5K 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4376557934
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jan 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 04 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients can request a copy of their medical record by contacting:
Well Health Port Credit
201-333 Lakeshore Road West
Mississauga, ON L5H 1G9
Phone: 905-274-7055
Fax: 905-274-0227
Date Received: 20 Apr 2025

Instructions/Address: Patients can request a copy of their medical record by contacting:

Well Health Port Credit
201-333 Lakeshore Road West
Mississauga, ON L5H 1G9
Phone: 905-274-7055
Fax: 905-607-2227
Date Received: 07 Apr 2025

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lori Coman-Wood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Coman-Wood (CPSO#: 58459 )
Business Address: 2180 Speakman Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5K 0B1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LORI RAE COMAN-WOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COMAN-WOOD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LORI RAE COMAN-WOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COMAN-WOOD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Jun 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 1988

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1987