THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:28:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge Ontario P1L 2E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 645 4400
Extension: 3139
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Pathology
Effective: 28 May 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 28 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Penswick Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Penswick (CPSO#: 58466 )
Business Address: 200 Manitoba Street
Suite 412
Bracebridge Ontario P1L 2E2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge Ontario P1L 2E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 645 4400
Extension: 3139
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Pathology
Effective: 28 May 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 28 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Penswick Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Penswick (CPSO#: 58466 )
Business Address: 200 Manitoba Street
Suite 412
Bracebridge Ontario P1L 2E2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN LAWRENCE PENSWICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PENSWICK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN LAWRENCE PENSWICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PENSWICK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1987