THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:32:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
Emergency Department
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 667-6538
Fax: (519) 667-6769
Address: 1-90 7th ave
Hanover
Hanover Ontario N4N 1N1
Phone: (519) 364-2340
Extension: 0
Fax: (519) 364-6602
Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
Urgent Care Department
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Health Force Ontario
7th Floor
285 Victoria Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W1
Phone: (416) 598-5960
Fax: (416) 598-5968

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 16 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Grey Bruce Health Services Lions Head Site Lions Head
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Clinton Public Hospital
LOCATION: Clinton

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Lions Head Site
LOCATION: Lions Head

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Murphy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Murphy (CPSO#: 58468 )
Business Address: Health Force Ontario
Emergency Department, Coverage Project
Suite 700
285 Victoria Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W1
(416) 598-5960
Business Address: 1-90 7th Avenue
Hanover Ontario N4N 1N1
(519) 364-2340
Business Address: 98 Shipley Street
Clinton Ontario N0M 1L0
(519) 482-3440
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Emergency Department
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 667-6538
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
Urgent Care
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
Emergency Department
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 667-6538
Fax: (519) 667-6769
Address: 1-90 7th ave
Hanover
Hanover Ontario N4N 1N1
Phone: (519) 364-2340
Extension: 0
Fax: (519) 364-6602
Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
Urgent Care Department
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Health Force Ontario
7th Floor
285 Victoria Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W1
Phone: (416) 598-5960
Fax: (416) 598-5968

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 16 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Grey Bruce Health Services Lions Head Site Lions Head
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Clinton Public Hospital
LOCATION: Clinton

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Lions Head Site
LOCATION: Lions Head

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Murphy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Murphy (CPSO#: 58468 )
Business Address: Health Force Ontario
Emergency Department, Coverage Project
Suite 700
285 Victoria Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W1
(416) 598-5960
Business Address: 1-90 7th Avenue
Hanover Ontario N4N 1N1
(519) 364-2340
Business Address: 98 Shipley Street
Clinton Ontario N0M 1L0
(519) 482-3440
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Emergency Department
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 667-6538
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
Urgent Care
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID GERARD MURPHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURPHY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID GERARD MURPHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURPHY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Oct 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1987