THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 04:06:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 198 Des Newman Boulevard
Whitby Ontario L1P 1Y5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057216168
Fax: 9057216605

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Thow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 May 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Thow (CPSO#: 58472 )
Business Address: 117 King Street East
Oshawa Ontario L1H 1B9
(905) 721-6168
Business Address: 198 Des Newman Boulevard
Whitby Ontario L1P 0P9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 198 Des Newman Boulevard
Whitby Ontario L1P 1Y5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057216168
Fax: 9057216605

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Thow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 May 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Thow (CPSO#: 58472 )
Business Address: 117 King Street East
Oshawa Ontario L1H 1B9
(905) 721-6168
Business Address: 198 Des Newman Boulevard
Whitby Ontario L1P 0P9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID PHILIP THOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOW is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID PHILIP THOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOW is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Jun 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 1988

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1987