THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:28:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1371 Neilson Road
Suite 211
Scarborough Ontario M1B 4Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 287-1891
Fax: (416) 287-8218
Address: Suite 405
4190 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1S 4T7
Phone: (416) 292-5666
Fax: (416) 292-6733

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 18 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. M. Chien Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chien (CPSO#: 58496 )
Business Address: Suite 410
1371 Neilson Road
Toronto Ontario M1B 4Z8
(416) 287-1891
Business Address: Suite 405
4190 Finch Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1S 4T7
(416) 292-5666
Business Address: 211-1371 Neilson Rd
Scarborough ON M1B 4Z8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1371 Neilson Road
Suite 211
Scarborough Ontario M1B 4Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 287-1891
Fax: (416) 287-8218
Address: Suite 405
4190 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1S 4T7
Phone: (416) 292-5666
Fax: (416) 292-6733

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 18 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. M. Chien Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chien (CPSO#: 58496 )
Business Address: Suite 410
1371 Neilson Road
Toronto Ontario M1B 4Z8
(416) 287-1891
Business Address: Suite 405
4190 Finch Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1S 4T7
(416) 292-5666
Business Address: 211-1371 Neilson Rd
Scarborough ON M1B 4Z8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIN MING CHIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIN MING CHIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 12 Feb 2018
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 12 Feb 2018
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. 

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1987