THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:12:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room 386
1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-5590
Fax: (416) 480-7875

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 06 Sep 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 06 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David M.J. Naimark Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Naimark (CPSO#: 58512 )
Business Address: 1929 Bayview Avenue
Suite 386
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
(416) 480-4773

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room 386
1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-5590
Fax: (416) 480-7875

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 06 Sep 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 06 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David M.J. Naimark Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Naimark (CPSO#: 58512 )
Business Address: 1929 Bayview Avenue
Suite 386
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
(416) 480-4773

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID MALCOLM JOSEPH NAIMARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAIMARK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID MALCOLM JOSEPH NAIMARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAIMARK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Oct 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Jun 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Mar 1991

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1990

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 1989

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 1989

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 1989

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 1989

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1987