THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:02:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1984
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 210
6855 Meadowvale Town Centre Circle
Mississauga Ontario L5N 2Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 826-8993
Fax: (905) 826-0520

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 07 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Helen Bai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Bai (CPSO#: 58514 )
Business Address: Suite 210
6855 Meadowvale Town Centre Circle
Mississauga Ontario L5N 2Y1
(905) 826-8993

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 210
6855 Meadowvale Town Centre Circle
Mississauga Ontario L5N 2Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 826-8993
Fax: (905) 826-0520

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 07 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Helen Bai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Bai (CPSO#: 58514 )
Business Address: Suite 210
6855 Meadowvale Town Centre Circle
Mississauga Ontario L5N 2Y1
(905) 826-8993

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HELEN HEE KYUNG BAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HELEN HEE KYUNG BAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 1989

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1987