THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:41:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 150 Sidney Street
Suite 2B
Belleville Ontario K8P 5E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 969-1454
Fax: 888-874-1030

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Aug 1989
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial
LOCATION: Trenton

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A.J. Forbes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Forbes (CPSO#: 58552 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 150 Sidney Street
Suite 2B
Belleville Ontario K8P 5E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 969-1454
Fax: 888-874-1030

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Aug 1989
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial
LOCATION: Trenton

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A.J. Forbes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Forbes (CPSO#: 58552 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW JOHN FORBES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORBES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW JOHN FORBES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORBES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1987