THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:00:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 402
65 Larch Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 670-0654
Fax: (705) 670-9348

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 25 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Espanola General Hospital
LOCATION: Espanola

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Clyde Hourtovenko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hourtovenko (CPSO#: 58556 )
Business Address: Unit 402
65 Larch Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 1B8
(705) 670-0654

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 402
65 Larch Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 670-0654
Fax: (705) 670-9348

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 25 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Espanola General Hospital
LOCATION: Espanola

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Clyde Hourtovenko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hourtovenko (CPSO#: 58556 )
Business Address: Unit 402
65 Larch Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 1B8
(705) 670-0654

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CLYDE DAVID HOURTOVENKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOURTOVENKO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CLYDE DAVID HOURTOVENKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOURTOVENKO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1987