THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:28:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1987
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1051 Wonderland Road South
London Ontario N6K 3X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 472-2060
Fax: (519) 471-7299

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Aug 1989
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anne Marie Monforton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Monforton (CPSO#: 58558 )
Business Address: 1051 Wonderland Rd S
London ON N6K 3X4
519-472-2060
Business Address: Aim Health Group
1051 Wonderland Road South
London Ontario N6K 3X4
(519) 472-2060

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1051 Wonderland Road South
London Ontario N6K 3X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 472-2060
Fax: (519) 471-7299

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Aug 1989
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anne Marie Monforton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Monforton (CPSO#: 58558 )
Business Address: 1051 Wonderland Rd S
London ON N6K 3X4
519-472-2060
Business Address: Aim Health Group
1051 Wonderland Road South
London Ontario N6K 3X4
(519) 472-2060

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNE MARIE MONFORTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONFORTON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNE MARIE MONFORTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONFORTON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1987