THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 04:05:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Garyounis University, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 301
222 King Street East
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 1P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 697-8022
Fax: (905) 697-6218

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 16 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shickh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shickh (CPSO#: 58601 )
Business Address: 301 - 222 King Street East
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 1P6
(905) 697-8022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Garyounis University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 301
222 King Street East
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 1P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 697-8022
Fax: (905) 697-6218

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 16 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shickh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shickh (CPSO#: 58601 )
Business Address: 301 - 222 King Street East
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 1P6
(905) 697-8022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALI MEHDI SHICKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHICKH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALI MEHDI SHICKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHICKH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Garyounis University, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Sep 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1987