THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:51:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10th floor-4711 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M2N 6K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164866368
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 07 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Rakoff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 May 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Rakoff (CPSO#: 58629 )
Business Address: 4711 Yonge Street
10th floor
Toronto Ontario M2N 6K8
4164866368

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10th floor-4711 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M2N 6K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164866368
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 07 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Rakoff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 May 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Rakoff (CPSO#: 58629 )
Business Address: 4711 Yonge Street
10th floor
Toronto Ontario M2N 6K8
4164866368

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID RAKOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAKOFF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID RAKOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAKOFF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1987