THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:42:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Sarajevo, 1985
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BOSNIAN, CROATIAN, SERBIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 130 Ontario Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2Y4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-9121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 06 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Oliver Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Oliver (CPSO#: 58632 )
Business Address: Corrections Canada
443 Union Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 4Y8
(613) 536-4527
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3310
Business Address: 130 Ontario Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2Y4
(613) 544-9121

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BOSNIAN, CROATIAN, SERBIAN
Medical School: University of Sarajevo, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 130 Ontario Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2Y4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-9121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 06 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Oliver Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Oliver (CPSO#: 58632 )
Business Address: Corrections Canada
443 Union Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 4Y8
(613) 536-4527
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3310
Business Address: 130 Ontario Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2Y4
(613) 544-9121

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DIJANA OLIVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLIVER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DIJANA OLIVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLIVER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Sarajevo, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Mar 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1987