THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:39:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1986
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 120 Eglington Avenue East, Suite 202
Toronto Ontario M4P 1E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-929-6931
Fax: 416-929-8533

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 07 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H. Wilansky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Wilansky (CPSO#: 58662 )
Business Address: 1849 Yonge St
Suite 615
Toronto ON M4S 1Y2

Corporation Name: Hannah Wilansky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Aug 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 120 Eglington Avenue East, Suite 202
Toronto Ontario M4P 1E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-929-6931
Fax: 416-929-8533

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 07 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H. Wilansky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Wilansky (CPSO#: 58662 )
Business Address: 1849 Yonge St
Suite 615
Toronto ON M4S 1Y2

Corporation Name: Hannah Wilansky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Aug 2018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANNAH WILANSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILANSKY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANNAH WILANSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILANSKY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1987