THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:03:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 564 Belmont Avenue West
Suite 206
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 7446691
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 03 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Potts Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Potts (CPSO#: 58721 )
Business Address: 202 - 475 Park Street
Kitchener Ontario N2G 4V5
(519) 744-8561
Business Address: 578 Leighland Drive
Waterloo Ontario N2T 2K2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 564 Belmont Avenue West
Suite 206
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 7446691
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 03 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Potts Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Potts (CPSO#: 58721 )
Business Address: 202 - 475 Park Street
Kitchener Ontario N2G 4V5
(519) 744-8561
Business Address: 578 Leighland Drive
Waterloo Ontario N2T 2K2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER GEORGE GILMOUR POTTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POTTS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER GEORGE GILMOUR POTTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POTTS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On August 27, 2009, at the The Superior Court of Justice, in Hamilton, Ontario, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Potts.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On August 27, 2009, at the The Superior Court of Justice, in Hamilton, Ontario, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Potts.

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Apr 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1987