THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:54:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 114
11811 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh Ontario N8N 4M7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 739-2157
Fax: (519) 739-2160

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 23 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Arizona
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. J. Winger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Winger (CPSO#: 58729 )
Business Address: Suite 114
11811 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh Ontario N8N 4M7
(519) 739-2157

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 114
11811 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh Ontario N8N 4M7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 739-2157
Fax: (519) 739-2160

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 23 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Arizona
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. J. Winger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Winger (CPSO#: 58729 )
Business Address: Suite 114
11811 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh Ontario N8N 4M7
(519) 739-2157

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOHN WINGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WINGER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOHN WINGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WINGER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1987