THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:14:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 721-4700
Extension: 2515
Fax: (613) 721-2582
Address: 10 Nadolny Sachs Pvt
Hillel Lodge
Ottawa ON K2A 4G7
Phone: 6137205353
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 9 Meridian Place
Ottawa Ontario K2G 6P8
Phone: 613-2742671
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1026 Baseline Rd
Villa Marconi LTC
Ottawa ON K2C 0A6
Phone: 613-727-6201
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 25 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fraser Miller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Sep 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Miller (CPSO#: 58778 )
Business Address: 9 Meridian Place
Ottawa Ontario K2G 6P8
(613) 580-2424 Extn: 30046
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 721-2000
Business Address: 1026 Baseline Rd
Ottawa ON K2C 0A6
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Rd
Nepean ON K2H 8P4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 721-4700
Extension: 2515
Fax: (613) 721-2582
Address: 10 Nadolny Sachs Pvt
Hillel Lodge
Ottawa ON K2A 4G7
Phone: 6137205353
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 9 Meridian Place
Ottawa Ontario K2G 6P8
Phone: 613-2742671
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1026 Baseline Rd
Villa Marconi LTC
Ottawa ON K2C 0A6
Phone: 613-727-6201
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 25 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fraser Miller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Sep 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Miller (CPSO#: 58778 )
Business Address: 9 Meridian Place
Ottawa Ontario K2G 6P8
(613) 580-2424 Extn: 30046
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 721-2000
Business Address: 1026 Baseline Rd
Ottawa ON K2C 0A6
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Rd
Nepean ON K2H 8P4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRASER ALEXANDER MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRASER ALEXANDER MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jun 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 1987