THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:46:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Bangalore University, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, KANNADA, TELUGU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 699 Concession Street
Juravinski Cancer Centre
Radiation Oncology
Hamilton Ontario L8V 4X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053879495
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 03 Dec 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.Jinka Sathya and Dr.Pushpa Sathya Medicine Professional corporation Inc
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sathya (CPSO#: 58815 )
Business Address: 699 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 4X2
9053879495

Corporation Name: Dr. Jinka Sathya and Dr. Pushpa Sathya Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Sep 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, KANNADA, TELUGU
Medical School: Bangalore University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 699 Concession Street
Juravinski Cancer Centre
Radiation Oncology
Hamilton Ontario L8V 4X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053879495
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 03 Dec 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.Jinka Sathya and Dr.Pushpa Sathya Medicine Professional corporation Inc
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sathya (CPSO#: 58815 )
Business Address: 699 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 4X2
9053879495

Corporation Name: Dr. Jinka Sathya and Dr. Pushpa Sathya Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Sep 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JINKA RUDRAPPA SATHYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SATHYA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JINKA RUDRAPPA SATHYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SATHYA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Bangalore University, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 1987