THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:58:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 295 Fourth Avenue
Unit B1
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0E7
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 905 9849616
Fax: 905 9371100
Address: 3531 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2J 2K5
Phone: 905 9371100
Fax: 905 9375040

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 21 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking a copy of their record can contact Niagara Health - St. Catharines Site: 1200 Fourth Ave, St. Catharines, ON L2S 0A9, Tel: (905) 378-4647, extension 44470, Fax: 905-684-1136.
Date Received: 06 Nov 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David C. Martin, Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Martin (CPSO#: 58837 )
Business Address: 102 - 93 Ontario Street
St Catharines Ontario L2R 5J7
(905) 984-3433

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 295 Fourth Avenue
Unit B1
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0E7
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 905 9849616
Fax: 905 9371100
Address: 3531 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2J 2K5
Phone: 905 9371100
Fax: 905 9375040

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 21 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking a copy of their record can contact Niagara Health - St. Catharines Site: 1200 Fourth Ave, St. Catharines, ON L2S 0A9, Tel: (905) 378-4647, extension 44470, Fax: 905-684-1136.
Date Received: 06 Nov 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David C. Martin, Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Martin (CPSO#: 58837 )
Business Address: 102 - 93 Ontario Street
St Catharines Ontario L2R 5J7
(905) 984-3433

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID CHARLES MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID CHARLES MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 13 Mar 2020
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 13 Mar 2020
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:

Training

Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1987
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 1987