THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:54:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2000 Credit Valley Road
Suite 413
Mississauga Ontario L5M 4N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 607-1262
Fax: 905 6071263

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 22 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nabil Philips Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Philips (CPSO#: 58838 )
Business Address: Suite 413
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga Ontario L5M 4N4
(905) 607-1262

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2000 Credit Valley Road
Suite 413
Mississauga Ontario L5M 4N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 607-1262
Fax: 905 6071263

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 22 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nabil Philips Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Philips (CPSO#: 58838 )
Business Address: Suite 413
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga Ontario L5M 4N4
(905) 607-1262

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NABIL ANTOUN PHILIPS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHILIPS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NABIL ANTOUN PHILIPS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHILIPS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 1987