THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:30:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1986
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-2696
Fax: (905) 813-4132
Address: Dynacare Medical Laboratory
115 Midair Court
Brampton Ontario L6T 5M3
Phone: (905) 790-3000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: 905-848-7661
Fax: 905-848-8313

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 May 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Linda Kapusta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 May 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Kapusta (CPSO#: 58879 )
Business Address: Room 1401A
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Address: Gamma Dynacare Medical Lab
115 Midair Court
Brampton Ontario L6T 5M3
(905) 790-3000
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
Suite H136
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2696

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-2696
Fax: (905) 813-4132
Address: Dynacare Medical Laboratory
115 Midair Court
Brampton Ontario L6T 5M3
Phone: (905) 790-3000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: 905-848-7661
Fax: 905-848-8313

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 May 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Linda Kapusta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 May 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Kapusta (CPSO#: 58879 )
Business Address: Room 1401A
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Address: Gamma Dynacare Medical Lab
115 Midair Court
Brampton Ontario L6T 5M3
(905) 790-3000
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
Suite H136
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2696

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINDA RAE KAPUSTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPUSTA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINDA RAE KAPUSTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPUSTA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 1987