THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:16:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 306
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2A 3Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 321-8328
Fax: (613) 728-3942

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 09 Aug 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 09 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey Abboud Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Dec 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Abboud (CPSO#: 58959 )
Business Address: 306 - 770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2A 3Z3
(613) 321-8328

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 306
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2A 3Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 321-8328
Fax: (613) 728-3942

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 09 Aug 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 09 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey Abboud Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Dec 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Abboud (CPSO#: 58959 )
Business Address: 306 - 770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2A 3Z3
(613) 321-8328

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY ABBOUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABBOUD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY ABBOUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABBOUD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Sep 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1987
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 1988

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 1987