THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:44:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1986
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 506
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
North York Ontario M2K 2W2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 229-2201
Fax: (416) 229-2261

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dana Liang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Liang (CPSO#: 59005 )
Business Address: 506 - 1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2K 2W2
(416) 229-2201

Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph Chen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Dec 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 506
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
North York Ontario M2K 2W2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 229-2201
Fax: (416) 229-2261

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dana Liang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Liang (CPSO#: 59005 )
Business Address: 506 - 1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2K 2W2
(416) 229-2201

Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph Chen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Dec 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANA YUE-CHING LIANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANA YUE-CHING LIANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1987
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 1987