THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:17:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Court
204 - 2863 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Ontario M1E 5E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 284-0488
Fax: (416) 284-9757

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 16 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Hummel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hummel (CPSO#: 59021 )
Business Address: Suite 204
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 5E9
(416) 284-0488

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Court
204 - 2863 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Ontario M1E 5E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 284-0488
Fax: (416) 284-9757

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 16 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Hummel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hummel (CPSO#: 59021 )
Business Address: Suite 204
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 5E9
(416) 284-0488

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN SIMON HUMMEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUMMEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN SIMON HUMMEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUMMEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1987
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 1987