THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:13:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1986
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 381 church st
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905)4727003
Fax: No Information Available
Address: UnionVille Home Society
4300 Highway 7
Markham Ontario L3R 1L8
Phone: 9054772822
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 20 Sep 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wendy Iseman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Iseman (CPSO#: 59052 )
Business Address: Unionville Home Society
4300 Highway 7
Markham Ontario L3R 1L8
(905) 472-2822
Business Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Box 1800
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7111

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 381 church st
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905)4727003
Fax: No Information Available
Address: UnionVille Home Society
4300 Highway 7
Markham Ontario L3R 1L8
Phone: 9054772822
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 20 Sep 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wendy Iseman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Iseman (CPSO#: 59052 )
Business Address: Unionville Home Society
4300 Highway 7
Markham Ontario L3R 1L8
(905) 472-2822
Business Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Box 1800
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7111

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WENDY ELLEN ISEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISEMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WENDY ELLEN ISEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISEMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1987
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 1987