THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 05:03:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1983
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: STSM HGH
580 Spence
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 0B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-844-304-1414
Fax: (613) 632-4791

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 16 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: France Rocheleau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Rocheleau (CPSO#: 59111 )
Business Address: 580 Spence
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 0B4
(844) 304-1414

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: STSM HGH
580 Spence
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 0B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-844-304-1414
Fax: (613) 632-4791

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 16 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: France Rocheleau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Rocheleau (CPSO#: 59111 )
Business Address: 580 Spence
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 0B4
(844) 304-1414

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANCE ROCHELEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROCHELEAU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANCE ROCHELEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROCHELEAU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 1987
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Dec 1987