THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:57:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-460 Brant St
Burlington ON L7R 4B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2897450051
Fax: 1-888-898-5095
Address: 1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington ON L7S 0A2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 29 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 19 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Philippe R. Beaudry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Beaudry (CPSO#: 59118 )
Business Address: 460 Brant St
Suite 201
Burlington ON L7R 4B6
289-745-0051`
Business Address: 1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington Ontario L7S 1W7
Business Address: Suite 303
720 Guelph Line
Burlington Ontario L7R 4E2
(905) 333-3300

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-460 Brant St
Burlington ON L7R 4B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2897450051
Fax: 1-888-898-5095
Address: 1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington ON L7S 0A2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 29 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 19 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Philippe R. Beaudry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Beaudry (CPSO#: 59118 )
Business Address: 460 Brant St
Suite 201
Burlington ON L7R 4B6
289-745-0051`
Business Address: 1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington Ontario L7S 1W7
Business Address: Suite 303
720 Guelph Line
Burlington Ontario L7R 4E2
(905) 333-3300

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHILIPPE RICHARD BEAUDRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEAUDRY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHILIPPE RICHARD BEAUDRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEAUDRY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 1987
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Dec 1987