THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:06:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2148 Carling Avenue
Suite 205
Ottawa Ontario K2A 1H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 596-0300
Fax: (613) 596-0848

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 19 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin David Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Smith (CPSO#: 59236 )
Business Address: Suite 205
2148 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2A 1H1
(613) 596-0300

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2148 Carling Avenue
Suite 205
Ottawa Ontario K2A 1H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 596-0300
Fax: (613) 596-0848

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 19 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin David Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Smith (CPSO#: 59236 )
Business Address: Suite 205
2148 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2A 1H1
(613) 596-0300

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
06 Dec 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 06 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from December 6, 2024, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Kevin David Smith in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Smith to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)

of

DR. KEVIN DAVID SMITH
(“Dr. Smith”)

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)

A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;

“Discipline Tribunal” means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;

“ICRC” means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College;

“IEP” means Individualized Education Plan;

“OHIP” means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

“Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal” means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;

“Practice Location” or “Practice Locations” means each and every location at which Dr. Smith practices, delegates, or has privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Out-of-Hospital Premises or Independent Health Facilities with which he is affiliated, in any jurisdiction;

“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.

(2) I, Dr. Smith, certificate of registration number 59236, am a member of the College.

(3) I, Dr. Smith, acknowledge that following a public complaint, the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number CAS-447762-L9P0X2 (the “Investigation”) into my ophthalmology practice.

B. UNDERTAKING

(4) I, Dr. Smith, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(5) Practice Restrictions

(a) I, Dr. Smith, undertake that I will not assess, treat, or provide surgical management of lacrimal drainage disorders.

(6) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Smith, undertake to inform the College of each and every one of my Practice Locations within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b) I, Dr. Smith, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Smith, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Smith, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix “A”.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(7) I, Dr. Smith, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(8) I, Dr. Smith, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(9) I, Dr. Smith, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(10) I, Dr. Smith, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location (“Chief of Staff” or “Chiefs of Staff”).

(11) I, Dr. Smith, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal of the College.

(12) I, Dr. Smith, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(13) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Smith, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Smith, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Following a public complaint, a College investigation was conducted into Dr. Smith’s ophthalmology practice. Dr. Smith had ceased assessing treating or providing surgical management of lacrimal drainage disorders as of July 2024, as well as other surgical procedures, and has undertaken to continue not to assess, treat, or provide surgical management of lacrimal drainage disorders.

D. CONSENT

(14) I, Dr. Smith, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(15) I, Dr. Smith, give my irrevocable consent to all Chiefs of Staff to disclose to the College, and to one another, any information relevant to this Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from December 6, 2024, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Kevin David Smith in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Smith to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)

of

DR. KEVIN DAVID SMITH
(“Dr. Smith”)

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)

A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;

“Discipline Tribunal” means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;

“ICRC” means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College;

“IEP” means Individualized Education Plan;

“OHIP” means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

“Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal” means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;

“Practice Location” or “Practice Locations” means each and every location at which Dr. Smith practices, delegates, or has privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Out-of-Hospital Premises or Independent Health Facilities with which he is affiliated, in any jurisdiction;

“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.

(2) I, Dr. Smith, certificate of registration number 59236, am a member of the College.

(3) I, Dr. Smith, acknowledge that following a public complaint, the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number CAS-447762-L9P0X2 (the “Investigation”) into my ophthalmology practice.

B. UNDERTAKING

(4) I, Dr. Smith, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(5) Practice Restrictions

(a) I, Dr. Smith, undertake that I will not assess, treat, or provide surgical management of lacrimal drainage disorders.

(6) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Smith, undertake to inform the College of each and every one of my Practice Locations within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b) I, Dr. Smith, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Smith, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Smith, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix “A”.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(7) I, Dr. Smith, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(8) I, Dr. Smith, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(9) I, Dr. Smith, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(10) I, Dr. Smith, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location (“Chief of Staff” or “Chiefs of Staff”).

(11) I, Dr. Smith, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal of the College.

(12) I, Dr. Smith, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(13) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Smith, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Smith, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Following a public complaint, a College investigation was conducted into Dr. Smith’s ophthalmology practice. Dr. Smith had ceased assessing treating or providing surgical management of lacrimal drainage disorders as of July 2024, as well as other surgical procedures, and has undertaken to continue not to assess, treat, or provide surgical management of lacrimal drainage disorders.

D. CONSENT

(14) I, Dr. Smith, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(15) I, Dr. Smith, give my irrevocable consent to all Chiefs of Staff to disclose to the College, and to one another, any information relevant to this Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 06 Dec 2024
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Kevin David Smith to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 6, 2024:
 
Following a public complaint, a College investigation was conducted into Dr. Smith’s ophthalmology practice. Dr. Smith had ceased assessing treating or providing surgical management of lacrimal drainage disorders as of July 2024, as well as other surgical procedures, and has undertaken to continue not to assess, treat, or provide surgical management of lacrimal drainage disorders.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 06 Dec 2024
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Kevin David Smith to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 6, 2024:
 
Following a public complaint, a College investigation was conducted into Dr. Smith’s ophthalmology practice. Dr. Smith had ceased assessing treating or providing surgical management of lacrimal drainage disorders as of July 2024, as well as other surgical procedures, and has undertaken to continue not to assess, treat, or provide surgical management of lacrimal drainage disorders.

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Mar 1988