THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:37:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Madras, 1982
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HAKKA

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2901 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite 306
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 266-6155
Fax: (416) 266-2827

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. M. LIAO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Liao (CPSO#: 59237 )
Business Address: suite 306-2901 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2T4
416-266-6155

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HAKKA
Medical School: University of Madras, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2901 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite 306
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 266-6155
Fax: (416) 266-2827

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. M. LIAO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Liao (CPSO#: 59237 )
Business Address: suite 306-2901 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2T4
416-266-6155

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUNU LIAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIAO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUNU LIAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIAO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Madras, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Mar 1988