THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:31:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto Rehab - Cardiac Program
347 Rumsey Road
Toronto Ontario M4G 1R7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 597-3422
Extension: 5267
Fax: (416) 597-7027

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 02 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Rumsey Centre Toronto
St John's Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Rumsey Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St John's Rehabilitation Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Oh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jun 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Oh (CPSO#: 59318 )
Business Address: Toronto Rehab - Cardiac Program
347 Rumsey Road
Toronto Ontario M4G 1R7
(416) 597-3422 Extn: 5263

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto Rehab - Cardiac Program
347 Rumsey Road
Toronto Ontario M4G 1R7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 597-3422
Extension: 5267
Fax: (416) 597-7027

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 02 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Rumsey Centre Toronto
St John's Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Rumsey Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St John's Rehabilitation Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Oh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jun 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Oh (CPSO#: 59318 )
Business Address: Toronto Rehab - Cardiac Program
347 Rumsey Road
Toronto Ontario M4G 1R7
(416) 597-3422 Extn: 5263

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL IN TAEK OH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL IN TAEK OH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988