THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:43:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Western Hospital
3rd Floor
Room 3MC-422
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-5800
Extension: 5616
Fax: (416) 603-5522

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Salonen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Salonen (CPSO#: 59332 )
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(416) 323-6400
Business Address: Princess Margaret Hospital
Suite 918 - 3rd Floor
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-2000
Business Address: Department of Medical Imaging
Toronto Western Hospital
University Health Network
3MC422 - 399 Bathurst Street, 3rd Floor
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5800 Extn: 5616
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 562 - 5th Floor
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-4800
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
1C-546
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-4800
Business Address: Health Sciences North, Ramsey Lake Health Centre, 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E5J1
705-523-7100

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Apr 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Western Hospital
3rd Floor
Room 3MC-422
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-5800
Extension: 5616
Fax: (416) 603-5522

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Salonen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Salonen (CPSO#: 59332 )
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(416) 323-6400
Business Address: Princess Margaret Hospital
Suite 918 - 3rd Floor
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-2000
Business Address: Department of Medical Imaging
Toronto Western Hospital
University Health Network
3MC422 - 399 Bathurst Street, 3rd Floor
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5800 Extn: 5616
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 562 - 5th Floor
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-4800
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
1C-546
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-4800
Business Address: Health Sciences North, Ramsey Lake Health Centre, 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E5J1
705-523-7100

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Apr 2017

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID CHARLES SALONEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALONEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID CHARLES SALONEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALONEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988