THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:00:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Regional Health
Centre - Emergency Department
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Extension: 6619
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 22 Oct 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Gannage Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Gannage (CPSO#: 59373 )
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
Emergency Room
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Regional Health
Centre - Emergency Department
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Extension: 6619
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 22 Oct 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Gannage Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Gannage (CPSO#: 59373 )
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
Emergency Room
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER GANNAGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANNAGE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER GANNAGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANNAGE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1988